Global Patent Index - EP 1041348 A2

EP 1041348 A2 2000-10-04 - Trap apparatus for installing an air conditioner

Title (en)

Trap apparatus for installing an air conditioner

Title (de)

Falle zum Installieren einer Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Piège pour l'installation d'un dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1041348 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106823 A

Priority

  • JP 9180699 A
  • JP 9457599 A

Abstract (en)

An object of the invention is to provided an easy method for installing an air conditioner taking an influence on environment into consideration. In the method for installing an air conditioner, an outdoor unit includes a compressor and an outdoor unit heat exchanger into both of which refrigerant gas is charged, an indoor unit includes an indoor unit heat exchanger which is opened into atmosphere, the outdoor unit and the indoor unit are connected through a connecting pipe opened to atmospher, air in the indoor unit heat exchanger and the connecting pipe is replaced by carbon dioxide and then, the carbon dioxide is collected by a trap apparatus having zeolite or calcium hydroxide, after the carbon dioxide is collected, the refrigerant gas in the outdoor unit is charged into the indoor unit heat exchanger or the connecting pipe, wherein when the air in the indoor unit heat exchanger and the connecting pipe is replaced by the carbon dioxide, pressure in the indoor unit heat exchanger and the connecting pipe is brought into a positive pressure state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F25B 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/26 (2013.01); F24F 1/0003 (2013.01); F25B 45/00 (2013.01); F25B 2309/06 (2013.01); F25B 2345/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041348 A2 20001004; EP 1041348 A3 20010704; EP 1041348 B1 20051221; DE 60024909 D1 20060126; DE 60024909 T2 20060629; ES 2254063 T3 20060616

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080330

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2254063 T3

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60024909 P 20060126

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2005-12-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.

2005-06-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TRAP APPARATUS FOR INSTALLING AN AIR CONDITIONER

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040309

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 1/00 A, 7F 25B 45/00 B

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI