Global Patent Index - EP 1041437 A1

EP 1041437 A1 2000-10-04 - Color photographic film exhibiting increased blue speed

Title (en)

Color photographic film exhibiting increased blue speed

Title (de)

Farbphotographischer Film mit verbesserter Empfindlichkeit im Blau

Title (fr)

Pellicule photographique couleur ayant rapidité au bleu améliorée

Publication

EP 1041437 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201001 A

Priority

  • US 28373999 A
  • US 28663499 A
  • US 28689799 A

Abstract (en)

A color photographic element is disclosed containing in its blue recording layer unit a blue light reflective layer positioned to receive light from a layer in the blue recording layer unit containing latent image forming silver halide grains of maximum sensitivity. The blue light reflective layer is free of blue absorbing dye and contains tabular silver halide grains having a thickness in the range of from 0.12 to 0.15 mu m, an average aspect ratio of greater than 15, and a coating coverage of 0.4 to 1.5 g/m<2>, and formed of greater than 50 mole percent bromide, based on silver, and the layer containing latent image forming silver halide grains of maximum sensitivity contains from 0.00 to 0.5 g/m<2> of randomly oriented silver halide grains of greater than 50 mole percent bromide, based on silver, having equivalent circular diameters in the range of from 0.05 to 0.5 mu m and free of adsorbed blue absorbing dye, where the combined coating coverage of the tabular silver halide grains in the blue light reflective layer and the randomly oriented silver halide grains in the layer containing latent image forming silver halide grains of maximum sensitivity is at least 0.5 g/m<2>, based on silver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/20 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/12 (2006.01); G03C 1/74 (2006.01); G03C 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/3022 (2013.01); G03C 7/3029 (2013.01); G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 7/3041 (2013.01); G03C 2200/11 (2013.01); G03C 2200/19 (2013.01); G03C 2200/42 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 7/3022 + G03C 2001/03511 + G03C 2001/0055 + G03C 2007/3025
  2. G03C 7/3022 + G03C 2001/03511 + G03C 2007/3025
  3. G03C 7/3029 + G03C 2200/11
  4. G03C 7/3029 + G03C 2200/11

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041437 A1 20001004; JP 2000305228 A 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031119

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI