Global Patent Index - EP 1041446 A1

EP 1041446 A1 2000-10-04 - Image receiving element with image receiving layer containing polyester resins

Title (en)

Image receiving element with image receiving layer containing polyester resins

Title (de)

Bildemfangsmaterial mit Polyesterharze enthaltender Empfangsschicht

Title (fr)

Elément récepteur avec couche réceptrice contenant des résines polyester

Publication

EP 1041446 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106199 A

Priority

US 28088599 A

Abstract (en)

An image-receiving material for use in electrophotography consists of a support with an imaging layer containing a water-sol and/or water-dispersible polyester resin.

Abstract (de)

Ein Bildempfangsmaterial für elektrofotografische Bebilderungsverfahren umfaßt einen Träger und eine Empfangsschicht, die ein wasserlösliches Polyesterharz und/oder ein wasserdispergierbares Polyesterharz enthält.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 7/00; B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/00 (2006.01); G03G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/0046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041446 A1 20001004; EP 1041446 B1 20041222; AT 285592 T 20050115; DE 50008989 D1 20050127; DK 1041446 T3 20050425; ES 2234468 T3 20050701; JP 2000305305 A 20001102; PT 1041446 E 20050429

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140323

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140322

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140322

2014-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140922

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140323

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 285592 T

- Effective date: 20140322

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140322

2014-10-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140922

2013-06-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234468 T3

2005-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-04-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008989 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FROASS, WILLIAM C.

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAYWARD BRADFORD, ARTHUR, III

2004-07-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IMAGE RECEIVING ELEMENT WITH IMAGE RECEIVING LAYER CONTAINING POLYESTER RESINS

2004-07-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-06-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IMAGE RECEIVING ELEMENT WITH IMAGE RECEIVING LAYER CONTAINING POLYESTER RESINS

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI