Global Patent Index - EP 1041459 B1

EP 1041459 B1 2002-09-18 - Escapement for timepiece

Title (en)

Escapement for timepiece

Title (de)

Hemmung für Zeitmesser

Title (fr)

Echappement pour garde-temps

Publication

EP 1041459 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99106602 A

Priority

EP 99106602 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041459A1] The mechanism drives a first wheel (6) which meshes with an identical driven wheel (7). Two plates (9,11) with ears (17,18) single tooth (20) are attached to the balance spring and the ears (17,18) receive impulses from raised teeth (13a,14a) on the driving and driven wheels (6,7). The single tooth (20) engages with a rocker (12) which has a spur (33) alternately blocking temporarily the two main wheels to produce a step by step escapement

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 15/10 (2006.01); G04B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 15/06 (2013.01); Y10T 74/1502 (2013.01); Y10T 74/19874 (2013.01); Y10T 74/19884 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041459 A1 20001004; EP 1041459 B1 20020918; DE 69902990 D1 20021024; DE 69902990 T2 20030522; JP 2000304873 A 20001102; US 6301981 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-25 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GLN GRESSET & LAESSER NEUCHATEL CABINET DE CONSEIL

2007-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GLN S.A.

2007-05-31 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: GLN GRESSET & LAESSER A ETE ENREGISTRE COMME MANDATAIRE PAR ERREUR.

2005-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2003-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902990 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI