Global Patent Index - EP 1041500 A2

EP 1041500 A2 2000-10-04 - Flexible agent-based negociators

Title (en)

Flexible agent-based negociators

Title (de)

Flexible auf Agenten basierende Verhandler

Title (fr)

Négociateur flexible basé sur des agents

Publication

EP 1041500 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301916 A

Priority

GB 9907477 A

Abstract (en)

A method for agent negotiation over a set of issues, between automated entities comprising the step of at least one of the entities making a counter-offer wherein its score for at least one of said issues is lowered and its score for at least one of said issues is raised. The method can be further used for negotiation over a set of issues comprising at lest one qualitative issue the values of the qualitative issues are mapped to qualitative values which are then used in the negotiation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 50/00 (2012.01); G06Q 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 50/00 (2013.01); G06Q 99/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041500 A2 20001004; EP 1041500 A3 20020911; CA 2303468 A1 20000930; GB 9907477 D0 19990526

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050324

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BUCKLE, PHILIP

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HADINGHAM, ROBERT

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JENNINGS, NICHOLAS ROBERT

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FARATIN, PEYMAN

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI