Global Patent Index - EP 1041500 A3

EP 1041500 A3 2002-09-11 - Flexible agent-based negociators

Title (en)

Flexible agent-based negociators

Title (de)

Flexible auf Agenten basierende Verhandler

Title (fr)

Négociateur flexible basé sur des agents

Publication

EP 1041500 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00301916 A

Priority

GB 9907477 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041500A2] A method for agent negotiation over a set of issues, between automated entities comprising the step of at least one of the entities making a counter-offer wherein its score for at least one of said issues is lowered and its score for at least one of said issues is raised. The method can be further used for negotiation over a set of issues comprising at lest one qualitative issue the values of the qualitative issues are mapped to qualitative values which are then used in the negotiation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 50/00 (2012.01); G06Q 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 50/00 (2013.01); G06Q 99/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] FARATIN P ET AL: "Negotiation decision functions for autonomous agents", ROBOTICS AND AUTONOMOUS SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER, vol. 24, no. 3-4, 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30), NL, pages 159 - 182, XP004140670, ISSN: 0921-8890
  • [X] MATOS N ET AL: "Determining successful negotiation strategies: an evolutionary approach", PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTI AGENT SYSTEMS (CAT. NO.98EX160), PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTI AGENT SYSTEMS, PARIS, FRANCE, 3-7 JULY 1998, 1998, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, pages 182 - 189, XP010292741, ISBN: 0-8186-8500-X
  • [A] OLIVER J R: "On artificial agents for negotiation in electronic commerce", PROCEEDINGS OF THE TWENTY-NINTH HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEM SCIENCES, PROCEEDINGS OF HICSS-29: 29TH HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEM SCIENCES, WAILEA, HI, USA, 3-6 JAN. 1996, 1996, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, pages 337 - 346 vol.4, XP002205086, ISBN: 0-8186-7333-8
  • [A] LAASRI B ET AL: "A generic model for intelligent negotiating agents", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INTELLIGENT & COOPERATIVE INFORMATION SYSTEMS, JUNE 1992, SINGAPORE, vol. 1, no. 2, pages 291 - 317, XP000603307, ISSN: 0218-2157

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041500 A2 20001004; EP 1041500 A3 20020911; CA 2303468 A1 20000930; GB 9907477 D0 19990526

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050324

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCKLE, PHILIP

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HADINGHAM, ROBERT

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JENNINGS, NICHOLAS ROBERT

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FARATIN, PEYMAN

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI