Global Patent Index - EP 1041502 A2

EP 1041502 A2 2000-10-04 - Real time auction bidding using wireless communication device

Title (en)

Real time auction bidding using wireless communication device

Title (de)

Echtzeitauktion mit drahtlosem Kommunikationsgerät

Title (fr)

Ventes aux enchères en temps réel utilisant un appareil de communication sans fil

Publication

EP 1041502 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302570 A

Priority

US 28204699 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an on-line auction system (100) supporting wireless network users (108) and wired network users (104, 106) as bidders. The auction system has an auction server (102) that conducts on-line auctions for items by allowing bidders to electronically submit bids, and a proxy server (116) that supports the wireless network users, receives auction update messages from the auction server, and stores auction information pertaining to the on-line auctions for which the wireless network users are participating. The wireless network users can access the stored auction information, can be alerted when a prior bid has been out-bid, and can increase the bid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/00 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); H04Q 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041502 A2 20001004; EP 1041502 A3 20021127; CN 1268714 A 20001004; JP 2000306035 A 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSSMANN, ALAIN S.

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEUMANN, GREGORY A.

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI