Global Patent Index - EP 1041519 A1

EP 1041519 A1 2000-10-04 - Device for controlling the speed of passage of discoidal elements

Title (en)

Device for controlling the speed of passage of discoidal elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Regulierung der Durchgangsgeschwindigkeit von scheibenförmigen Elementen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour réguler la vitesse de passage des éléments discoides

Publication

EP 1041519 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00500049 A

Priority

ES 9900653 A

Abstract (en)

The device comprises a cylindrical member arranged with a given inclination relative to the horizontal, facing the inlet for discoidal elements, bringing about point-form contact between the control member and the discoidal piece for the purposes of regularising the reduction of the kinetic energy of an incoming discoidal piece, and also the speed of displacement along the path for the discoidal pieces, which path is determined by an inclined guide arranged as a continuation of the cylindrical control member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041519 A1 20001004; EP 1041519 B1 20081008; DE 60040429 D1 20081120; ES 2153770 A1 20010301; ES 2153770 B1 20011001; ES 2315222 T3 20090401

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-22 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: AZKOYEN , S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120509

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090329

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090329

2009-09-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090217

2009-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2315222

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2008-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60040429

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-11-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2008-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2008-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AZKOYEN MEDIOS DE PAGO, S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GAMING TECHNOLOGY DISTRIBUTION, S.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070413

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI