Global Patent Index - EP 1041523 A3

EP 1041523 A3 2000-10-11 - Transaction recordal and validation

Title (en)

Transaction recordal and validation

Title (de)

Transaktionsaufzeichnung und -beglaubigung

Title (fr)

Enregistrement et validation de transaction

Publication

EP 1041523 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00302584 A

Priority

GB 9907513 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041523A2] A method of recording details of a transaction at a terminal comprising the steps: identifying a user at a terminal; the user then instructing a transaction; the terminal retaining an image of a feature of at least one of the user and the transaction; generating a transaction identifier at a remote location; and correlating the transaction identifier with the user identity, the retained image, and at least one feature of the transaction in a respective transaction record. The transaction record may subsequently be reviewed to verify details of the transaction, for example the terminal may retain an image of the user and images of currency deposited in the terminal by the user. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/10; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01); G07G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07C 9/00079 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07G 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041523 A2 20001004; EP 1041523 A3 20001011; GB 9907513 D0 19990526

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI