Global patent index - EP 1041532 A2

EP 1041532 A2 2000-10-04 - Method and Apparatus for calibrating a computer-generated projected image

Title (en)

Method and Apparatus for calibrating a computer-generated projected image

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kalibrierung eines rechnererzeugten projizierten Bildes

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil de calibrage d'une image de projection générée par ordinateur

Publication

EP 1041532 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106722 A

Priority

US 28309399 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus and method for calibrating a computer-generated projected image to the displayed image viewed on the computer screen. Four or more calibration spots, at least three of which are collinear, arrayed in a predetermined pattern in both the displayed and the projected images, are optically imaged and electronically discriminated in the projected image, their coordinates ascertained and related to the predetermined pattern so as to derive transformation coefficients used in the process of converting a location on the projected image to the corresponding location in the displayed image.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/00; G06F 3/147

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/041 (2006.01); G06F 3/038 (2013.01); G06F 3/042 (2006.01); G06F 3/147 (2006.01); G06F 3/153 (2006.01); G09G 3/00 (2006.01); G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01); H04N 5/74 (2006.01); H04N 9/31 (2006.01); H04N 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 9/3194 (2013.01); G06F 3/0386 (2013.01); G06F 3/0418 (2013.01); G06F 3/147 (2013.01); G09G 3/002 (2013.01); H04N 9/3185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041532 A2 20001004; EP 1041532 A3 20060628; CN 1156758 C 20040707; CN 1270352 A 20001018; JP 2000357055 A 20001226; JP 3885458 B2 20070221; KR 100452413 B1 20041012; KR 20010020668 A 20010315; US 6292171 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140913

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070417

2007-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI