Global Patent Index - EP 1041584 A3

EP 1041584 A3 2001-01-31 - Foil conductor

Title (en)

Foil conductor

Title (de)

Leiterfolie

Title (fr)

Conducteur à feuille

Publication

EP 1041584 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105454 A

Priority

DE 19914907 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1041584A2] The foil has an elastically deformable, non-conducting carrier foil strip (2) on which several adjacent, externally insulate conductive tracks (3) are arranged to lie adjacent to each other in the longitudinal direction. The conductive foil has at least shaping element (4) in the longitudinal direction that is electrically isolated from the conductive tracks and that retains its shape when deformed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 5/14 (2006.01); H01B 7/08 (2006.01); H01B 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/0869 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041584 A2 20001004; EP 1041584 A3 20010131; EP 1041584 B1 20040901; DE 19914907 C1 20001102; JP 2000315427 A 20001114; US 2002046870 A1 20020425; US 6417455 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-10-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20070604

2007-10-24 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20070604

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-07-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-01-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007581

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI