Global Patent Index - EP 1041596 A2

EP 1041596 A2 2000-10-04 - Thermal triggering device for circuit breaker

Title (en)

Thermal triggering device for circuit breaker

Title (de)

Thermische Auslöseeinrichtung für Leitungsschutzschalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déclenchement thermique pour disjoncteur

Publication

EP 1041596 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103371 A

Priority

DE 19914479 A

Abstract (en)

The thermal trigger has an actuating pin (15) mounted to move in a carrier body (11) and to protrude from it through an expa chamber section (12) that can be thermally disengaged by a bimetallic snap displacement element (18) mounted at the edge. A flat heating element (21) for the snap displacement arrangement is mounted in the chamber section for thermal triggering.

Abstract (de)

Eine thermische Auslöseeinrichtung für Leitungsschutzschalter besitzt einen in einem Tragkörper 11 verschiebbar gelagerten und aus diesem durch einen erweiterten Kammerabschnitt 12 vorstehenden Betätigungsstößel 14, der thermisch mittels einer im Kammerabschnitt 12 randseitig gehaltenen Bimetall-Schnappscheibenanordnung 18 ausrückbar ist, wobei in dem Kammerabschnitt 12 zur thermischen Auslösung ein stromdurchflossenes flächiges Heizelement 21 für die Bimetall-Schnappscheibenanordnung 18 vorgesehen ist. Die Bimetall-Schnappscheibenanordnung 18 wird ständig über die gesamte Fläche beheizt und erreicht daher vorteilhaft mit sehr geringer Verzugszeit die Temperatur des Heizelements 18, wodurch eine hohe Auslösesicherheit und ein schnelles Ansprechen gewährleistet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041596 A2 20001004; EP 1041596 A3 20020116; EP 1041596 B1 20040114; AT 257975 T 20040115; DE 19914479 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060223

2005-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005000 P 20040219

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEINRICH KOPP AG

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI