Global patent index - EP 1041755 A2

EP 1041755 A2 2000-10-04 - Method for transmitting and processing traffic information

Title (en)

Method for transmitting and processing traffic information

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Übertragung und Verarbeitung von Verkehrsinformationen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la transmission et pour le traitement d'informations routières

Publication

EP 1041755 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103862 A

Priority

DE 19914041 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves sending a digital coded message that includes a time stamp indicating the respective time the event was recorded. The message is stored in a buffer with several messages of the same event being used to measure the duration of the ev using the time stamp information.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Information von Autofahrern, wobei digital codierte Verkehrsmeldungen empfangen und zwischengespeichert werden, wird mit den empfangenen Verkehrsmeldungen jeweils ein Zeitstempel gespeichert. Aus Ausmaßen und den Zeitstempeln mehrerer gespeicherter Verkehrsmeldungen, die das gleiche Ereignis betreffen, wird ein Maß für die Dauer des Ereignisses und/oder die Änderung des Ausmaßes abgeleitet. Die Änderung wird angezeigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/092 (2013.01); G08G 1/093 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19914041 A1 20000928; EP 1041755 A2 20001004; EP 1041755 A3 20050427; US 6477459 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status

2014-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOMTOM GLOBAL ASSETS B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-01-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI