Global Patent Index - EP 1041831 A1

EP 1041831 A1 2000-10-04 - Terminal and method for accessing information services in a telecommunications network

Title (en)

Terminal and method for accessing information services in a telecommunications network

Title (de)

Endgerät und Verfahren für Zugriff auf Informationsdiensten in einem Telekommunikationsnetzwerk

Title (fr)

Terminal et procédé d'accès à des services d'information dans un réseau de télécommunication

Publication

EP 1041831 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99400773 A

Priority

EP 99400773 A

Abstract (en)

A telecommunications terminal (11) for accessing a plurality of services (such as e-commerce) in a telecommunications infrastructure (1,2,3) includes a selection facility (22) for choosing a list of actions from a store (21) appropriate to the type of service requested via an input (19) from the user. The invention provides a mobile terminal capable of performing local monitoring tasks and of executing remote tasks in the fixed infrastructure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/22; H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 7/22 (2006.01); H04Q 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041831 A1 20001004; CN 1147184 C 20040421; CN 1269683 A 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080202

2007-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070921

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001007

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI