Global Patent Index - EP 1041857 A2

EP 1041857 A2 2000-10-04 - Implantable hearing system with audiometer

Title (en)

Implantable hearing system with audiometer

Title (de)

Implantierbares Hörsystem mit Audiometer

Title (fr)

Système auditif implantable avec audiomètre

Publication

EP 1041857 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122698 A

Priority

DE 19914992 A

Abstract (en)

The implanted hearing aid system has a microphone (10) coupled via an audio signal processing path with electronic signal processing and an amplification circuits (40,50,80) to an electromechanical transducer (20). An electronic audiometer module (90 incorporated in the audio signal processing path of the hearing aid system, for providing audiometry signals for audiological subjective evaluation of the electromechanical transducer.

Abstract (de)

Teil- oder vollimplantierbares Hörsystem zur Rehabilitation einer reinen Innenohrschwerhörigkeit oder einer kombinierten Schalleitungs- und Innenohrschwerhörigkeit, mit einem ein Audiosignal abgebenden Mikrofon (10), einer in einem audiosignalverarbeitenden, elektronischen Hörsystempfad liegenden elektronischen Signalbearbeitungs- und Verstärkungsseinheit (40, 50, 80, 140, 141), einem implantierbaren elektromechanischen Ausgangswandler (20) und einer Einheit (60) zur energetischen Versorgung des Implantates, wobei das Hörsystem durch ein elektronisches Modul (90, 140, 141) ergänzt ist, das Audiometriesignale für eine audiologische, subjektive Untersuchung und Bewertung der Ankopplungsgüte des elektromechanischen Ausgangswandlers (20) erzeugt und in den Audiosignalverarbeitungsweg des Hörimplantates einspeist.. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/606 (2013.01); H04R 25/505 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1041857 A2 20001004; EP 1041857 A3 20060531; EP 1041857 B1 20120307; AT 548861 T 20120315; AU 2226700 A 20001005; AU 766943 B2 20031023; CA 2300636 A1 20001001; DE 19914992 A1 20001207; US 6788790 B1 20040907

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-04 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59915325

- Effective date: 20121210

2013-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121210

2012-05-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59915325

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-03-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 548861 T

- Effective date: 20120315

2012-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2008-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080409

2007-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2007-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061128

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COCHLEAR LIMITED

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI