Global patent index - EP 1041964 A1

EP 1041964 A1 2000-10-11 - METHOD AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING DERMATOLOGICAL AGING AND FOR REDUCING BRUISING

Title (en)

METHOD AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING DERMATOLOGICAL AGING AND FOR REDUCING BRUISING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON DERMATOLOGISCHER ALTERUNG UND ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON QUETSCHUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET COMPOSITIONS POUR REDUIRE LE VIEILLISSEMENT DE LA PEAU ET LES CONTUSIONS

Publication

EP 1041964 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99968624 A

Priority

  • US 9920854 W
  • US 9969898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0013661A1] Methods to reduce susceptibility to, severity or duration of, bruising of skin and topical compositions for practicing such methods. The topical compositions comprise an isoflavonoid and a vehicle. The invention also includes a synergistic topical composition that includes, in addition to the isoflavonoid and vehicle, secondary components selected from specific classes of compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/63 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/676 (2013.01); A61K 8/35 (2013.01); A61K 8/365 (2013.01); A61K 8/498 (2013.01); A61K 8/602 (2013.01); A61K 8/63 (2013.01); A61K 8/671 (2013.01); A61K 8/97 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61Q 19/08 (2013.01); A61K 2800/782 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0013661 A1 20000316; AU 6034599 A 20000327; BR 9906998 A 20000926; CA 2309179 A1 20000316; EP 1041964 A1 20001011; EP 1041964 A4 20030903

INPADOC legal status

2010-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100401

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-09-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030717

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI