Global Patent Index - EP 1042003 A1

EP 1042003 A1 2000-10-11 - DELIVERY OF LONG LASTING THERAPEUTIC AGENTS BY FORMING COVALENT ATTACHMENTS IN VIVO

Title (en)

DELIVERY OF LONG LASTING THERAPEUTIC AGENTS BY FORMING COVALENT ATTACHMENTS IN VIVO

Title (de)

VERABREICHUNG ÜBER LÄNGERE ZEIT WIRKSAMER THERAPEUTISCHEN MITTEL DURCH BILDUNG KOVALENTER BINDUNGEN IN VIVO

Title (fr)

APPORT LOCAL D'AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES A ACTION PROLONGEE

Publication

EP 1042003 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916153 A

Priority

  • US 9906344 W
  • US 7897498 P
  • US 8635298 P
  • US 8620598 P
  • US 10739198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948536A2] This invention relates to the field of therapeutic agents in medicine. In particular, this invention relates to the field of localized delivery of therapeutic agents wherein the agents are capable of covalently bonding to a site of interest <i>in vivo</i>, to provide increased tissue retention and pharmacodynamic duration of therapeutic benefit for the given drug. In addition, the invention includes the non-specific labeling of fixed blood proteins and tissues with N-Hydroxy-Succinimide (NHS)-drugs and sulfo-NHS drugs, although other reactive groups, which are functional in an aqueous medium such as blood, may also be employed.

[origin: WO9948536A2] Methods of and compositions for localized delivery of therapeutic agents which are capable of forming covalent bonds with a site of interest are disclosed. Therapeutic agents useful in the invention include wound healing agents, antibiotics, anti-inflammatories, anti-oxidants, anti-proliferatives, immunosupressants, anti-infective and anti-cancer agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 47/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948536A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948536 A2 19990930; WO 9948536 A3 20010517; AU 3452799 A 19991018; AU 748496 B2 20020606; CA 2291066 A1 19990930; EP 1042003 A1 20001011; IL 133053 D0 20010319; JP 2002512640 A 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051001

2001-08-08 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2001-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 47/48 A, 7A 61K 51/04 B, 7A 61K 39/385 B, 7A 61K 51/08 B

2001-06-27 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991226

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19991222;LT PAYMENT 19991222;LV PAYMENT 19991222;RO PAYMENT 19991222;SI PAYMENT 19991222