Global Patent Index - EP 1042030 A2

EP 1042030 A2 2000-10-11 - APPARATUS FOR SUPPLYING RADIOACTIVE GAS TO A DELIVERY DEVICE

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR SUPPLYING RADIOACTIVE GAS TO A DELIVERY DEVICE

Title (de)

GERÄT ZUR ZUFÜHRUNG EINES RADIOAKTIVEN GASES ZU EINEM VERABREICHUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRANSPORTER DU GAZ RADIOACTIF VERS UN SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION

Publication

EP 1042030 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98960455 A

Priority

  • US 9825129 W
  • US 7026297 P
  • US 7528498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933515A2] Disclosed is a catheter apparatus filled with a radiation carrier material such as an inert radioactive gas for the treatment of restenosis after angioplasty, and malignancies. The inflated catheter includes a single unit or alternatively, a plurality of discrete chambers for transporting the radioactive carrier material and through which, blood may continue to flow during treatment with the prescribed radiation. When the radioactive carrier is a gas such as Xenon 133, an injection apparatus (1400) may be used that permits use of a standard radioactive gas source vial (1401) that may be loaded into the radioactive source vial enclosure or chamber (1403). The means for enclosing the vial (1404) may also serve as an urging mechanism (1442) to urge the source vial (1401) toward one or more piercing cannulae (1406, 1454) which permit delivery of the radioactive gas to the catheter. In one series of embodiments, the radioactive gas is withdrawn through a selector means (1409) such as a multiple position valve into a gas-tight variable volume chamber (1411) such as a syringe which then is deployed to deliver the gas into the catheter. Following treatment, the gas is withdrawn into the syringe and returned to the source vial (1401). In another series of embodiments a syringe filled with a liquid is used to displace the gas either directly into the delivery catheter (1422), or into a second syringe which injects the gas to the delivery catheter (1422).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 36/06; A61N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 36/04 (2006.01); A61M 36/12 (2006.01); A61N 5/10 (2006.01); A61F 2/958 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/10182 (2013.11); A61M 25/10185 (2013.11); A61N 5/1002 (2013.01); A61M 25/1018 (2013.01); A61N 2005/1021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933515 A2 19990708; WO 9933515 A3 19990916; AU 1604099 A 19990719; AU 737096 B2 20010809; CA 2316963 A1 19990708; EP 1042030 A2 20001011; JP 2001526946 A 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031129

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: APPLE, MARC G. .

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COOK INCORPORATED

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MED INSTITUTE, INC.

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT