Global Patent Index - EP 1042074 A1

EP 1042074 A1 2000-10-11 - ROTARY APPLICATOR HEAD

Title (en)

ROTARY APPLICATOR HEAD

Title (de)

ROTATIONSAUFTRAGSKOPF

Title (fr)

TETE D'APPLICATION ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 1042074 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966344 A

Priority

  • DE 19757238 A
  • DE 19757237 A
  • EP 9808246 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6464785B1] An application head (11) for contract-free application of hot-melt adhesive onto a width of material (22) has a housing (12) with a control slide chamber (20). A cylinder control slide (13) is supported and is rotatably drivable in the housing. At least one supply aperture introduces an adhesive into the control slide chamber (20). A slotted nozzle (18) releases the adhesive. The slotted nozzle is controllable by the cylinder control slide (13). The nozzle extends transversely to the direction of movement of the width of material (22). The cylinder control slide (13) has a cylindrical surface which is able to seal the slotted nozzle (18) from the inside. The control slide (13) also has surface grooves (17) in the cylindrical surface. The grooves, as a function of their rotational positions, are able to communicate with the slotted nozzle. Furthermore, the cylinder control slide (13) inside the control slide chamber, has either an inner cavity (29) supplied with medium through a supply aperture, as well as radial exit bores (28) leading from the inner cavity into the surface grooves, or it has a helical or spiral-shaped surface groove in the cylindrical surface, as well as a storage volume for medium, which communicates with the at least one surface groove.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02; B05C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/14 (2006.01); B05C 1/10 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/1026 (2013.01); B05C 1/10 (2013.01); B05C 5/0258 (2013.01); B05C 5/0275 (2013.01); B05C 5/0233 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932233A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6464785 B1 20021015; EP 1042074 A1 20001011; EP 1042074 B1 20030402; JP 2001526114 A 20011218; JP 3504921 B2 20040308; US 2003000464 A1 20030102; US 6827777 B2 20041207; WO 9932233 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151216

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091216

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2005-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NORDSON CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-05-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NORDSON CORPORATION

- Free text: PUFFE, WOLFGANG#SIEGDAMM 40#53721 SIEGBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- NORDSON CORPORATION#28601 CLEMENS ROAD#WESTLAKE, OHIO 44145-1119 (US)

2005-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI NL SE