Global Patent Index - EP 1042087 A1

EP 1042087 A1 2000-10-11 - DEVICE FOR FEEDING MOLTEN METAL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FEEDING MOLTEN METAL

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR ZUFÜHRUNG VON METALLSCHMELZE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'AMENEE DE METAL EN FUSION

Publication

EP 1042087 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966566 A

Priority

  • DE 9803761 W
  • DE 19758142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19758142A1] The invention relates to a device for feeding molten metal, especially liquid steel, through submerged casting tubes of an intermediate tank in a stationary permanent mold of a continuos slab casting installation. The intermediate tank (21) is configured as a casting chamber (22) fitted with a vacuum pump (27), said casting chamber being connected to a main chamber (23) into which the molten mass (S) is fed from the outside. The floor (24) of the casting chamber (22) is fitted with at least three adjacent submerged casting tubes (31-3n).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10; B22D 41/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/103 (2006.01); B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/113 (2006.01); B22D 41/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/113 (2013.01); B22D 41/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932248A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19758142 A1 19990701; AT 208671 T 20011115; AU 2410299 A 19990712; AU 744237 B2 20020221; BR 9813755 A 20001003; CA 2314076 A1 19990701; CN 1098738 C 20030115; CN 1282279 A 20010131; EP 1042087 A1 20001011; EP 1042087 B1 20011114; ES 2167963 T3 20020516; JP 2001526119 A 20011218; WO 9932248 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031214

2004-08-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031214

2003-12-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031214

2002-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021204

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021202

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021119

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167963 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802177 20011220

2001-12-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208671 T 20011115

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE