Global Patent Index - EP 1042101 A1

EP 1042101 A1 2000-10-11 - METHOD FOR MAKING SOLDERING FLUX AND RESULTING WELD JOINT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING SOLDERING FLUX AND RESULTING WELD JOINT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER HARTLÖTPASTE UND ALSO HERGESTELLTE LÖTVERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE PATE A BRASER ET JOINT DE SOUDURE OBTENU

Publication

EP 1042101 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98963615 A

Priority

  • FR 9802855 W
  • FR 9716349 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772657A1] A brazing paste, comprising a brazing metal matrix (10) containing a homogeneous dispersion of superelastic alloy particles (5) coated with a wettable metal, is new. An Independent claim is also included for production of the above by incorporating the superelastic alloy particles (5) in the brazing metal matrix (10). Preferred Features: The paste contains 5-30 vol.% of 1-50 mu diameter spherical superelastic alloy particles (5) which consist of Ni-Ti, Cu-Zn-Al or Cu-Al-Ni shape memory alloy and which are coated with Cu, Ni, Au, Sn, Ag or Pb.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 35/14; B23K 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 35/02 (2006.01); B23K 35/14 (2006.01); H05K 3/34 (2006.01); B23K 35/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 35/025 (2013.01); B23K 35/0244 (2013.01); H05K 3/3484 (2013.01); B23K 35/262 (2013.01); H05K 3/3442 (2013.01); H05K 2201/0215 (2013.01); H05K 2201/0218 (2013.01); H05K 2201/0308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933604A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772657 A1 19990625; FR 2772657 B1 20000303; EP 1042101 A1 20001011; US 6383305 B1 20020507; WO 9933604 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-02-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SOLDER PASTE AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020424

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI FR GB IT NL SE