Global Patent Index - EP 1042123 A1

EP 1042123 A1 2000-10-11 - ROLLER

Title (en)

ROLLER

Title (de)

WALZE

Title (fr)

ROULEAU

Publication

EP 1042123 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966565 A

Priority

  • DE 9803756 W
  • DE 19757815 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757815C1] In a roller with several ink balls, a bearing is mounted between the ink balls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933667A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757815 C1 19990722; EP 1042123 A1 20001011; EP 1042123 B1 20011017; US 6349644 B1 20020226; WO 9933667 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051222

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051222

2005-12-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-12-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801819 20011122

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOHRMANN, HANS, DIERK

2001-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MASUCH, BERND, KURT

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI