Global Patent Index - EP 1042126 A1

EP 1042126 A1 2000-10-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING A COLOUR PATTERN ON OR INTO AN OBJECT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING A COLOUR PATTERN ON OR INTO AN OBJECT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUF- UND/ODER EINBRINGEN EINES FARBDEKORS AUF BZW. IN EINEN GEGENSTAND

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER UN DECOR COLORE SUR UN ARTICLE ET/OU POUR L'INTRODUIRE A L'INTERIEUR DUDIT ARTICLE

Publication

EP 1042126 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910167 A

Priority

  • DE 19804218 A
  • EP 9900601 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804218A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for transferring a colour pattern on or into an object (10), using a support (12) which is printed with the colour pattern. The colour pattern is transferred from the support (12) onto an object (10) to be decorated. A gas jet (20) is used to help apply the support (12) to the object (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/1716 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939915A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804218 A1 19990805; CA 2323963 A1 19990812; EP 1042126 A1 20001011; EP 1042126 B1 20020522; ES 2173725 T3 20021016; US 6656230 B1 20031202; WO 9939915 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070129

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070130

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2008-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070130

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173725 T3

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901490 20020627

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUSH INDUSTRIES, INC.

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUSH VIOTECHNIK GMBH

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL