Global Patent Index - EP 1042127 A1

EP 1042127 A1 2000-10-11 - POLYMERIC FILM HAVING A COATING LAYER OF A PHOSPHONIC ACID GROUP CONTAINING POLYMER

Title (en)

POLYMERIC FILM HAVING A COATING LAYER OF A PHOSPHONIC ACID GROUP CONTAINING POLYMER

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFFFOLIE DIE MIT EINEM FOSFONICSÄUREGRUPPENENTHALTENDEN POLYMER BESCHICHTET IST

Title (fr)

FILM POLYMERE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE REVETEMENT EN POLYMERE CONTENANT DES GROUPES D'ACIDES PHOSPHONIQUES

Publication

EP 1042127 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98965992 A

Priority

  • GB 9726994 A
  • US 9826588 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932303A1] A polymeric film which is substantially gelatin free has a polymeric film substrate and a coating layer containing a polymer having at least one or more repeating units having at least one or more pendant (-P0XY) groups, wherein X and Y, which may be the same or different, are OH or OM wherein M is a cation. The polymeric film is suitable for use as a component of a printing plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/30 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01); C08J 7/04 (2006.01); C09D 143/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932303A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932303 A1 19990701; AU 2199799 A 19990712; CN 1195643 C 20050406; CN 1283153 A 20010207; DE 69808801 D1 20021121; DE 69808801 T2 20030703; EP 1042127 A1 20001011; EP 1042127 B1 20021016; GB 9726994 D0 19980218; JP 2003525952 A 20030902; JP 2010242092 A 20101028; JP 4689821 B2 20110525; JP 5437924 B2 20140312

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161206

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808801 20021121

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUPONT TEIJIN FILMS U.S. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010510

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL