Global Patent Index - EP 1042132 A1

EP 1042132 A1 2000-10-11 - DIAMOND OR GEMSTONE MARKING BY PLURALITY OF GROOVES

Title (en)

DIAMOND OR GEMSTONE MARKING BY PLURALITY OF GROOVES

Title (de)

MARKIEREN VON DIAMANTEN ODER EDELSTEINEN MITTELS MEHRERER NUTEN

Title (fr)

MARQUAGE D'UN DIAMANT OU D'UNE PIERRE PRECIEUSE, SOUS FORME DE PLUSIEURS RAINURES

Publication

EP 1042132 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962614 A

Priority

  • GB 9803889 W
  • GB 9727364 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2332651A] The surface of a diamond gemstone is marked with an alphanumeric character in the form of parallel grooves 10 using a focussed ion beam (eg gallium), excimer laser or plasma etching. The mark cannot be read with the naked eye, the grooves producing a visible diffraction effect such that the mark can be read under magnification. The marked diamond 104 may be viewed using a microscope when illuminated by two directional light sources 106 at an angle corresponding to the angle of diffraction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44B 7/00; G02B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 27/00 (2006.01); B44B 7/00 (2006.01); B44C 1/22 (2006.01); G02B 21/00 (2006.01); G09F 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44B 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933671A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2332651 A 19990630; GB 2332651 B 20011107; GB 9828393 D0 19990217; AU 1774399 A 19990719; AU 746557 B2 20020502; CA 2316957 A1 19990708; CA 2316957 C 20040427; CN 1146506 C 20040421; CN 1284916 A 20010221; DE 69820295 D1 20040115; DE 69820295 T2 20041021; EP 1042132 A1 20001011; EP 1042132 B1 20031203; ES 2212385 T3 20040716; GB 9727364 D0 19980225; HK 1020032 A1 20020419; IL 136967 D0 20010614; JP 2001526996 A 20011225; JP 2009285733 A 20091210; JP 4497720 B2 20100707; RU 2215659 C2 20031110; TW 458836 B 20011011; WO 9933671 A1 19990708; ZA 9811838 B 20000623

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DE BEERS UK LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DE BEERS CENTENARY AG, LUCERN, CH

- Document: DE 69820295

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DE BEERS CENTENARY AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GERSAN ESTABLISHMENT, VADUZ, LI

- Document: DE 69820295

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DE BEERS UK LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GERSAN ESTABLISHMENT, VADUZ, LI

- Document: DE 69820295

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081224

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081224

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212385 T3

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820295 P 20040115

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2003-05-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011130

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL