Global Patent Index - EP 1042153 A1

EP 1042153 A1 2000-10-11 - FLEXIBLE CLOSURE ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

FLEXIBLE CLOSURE ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

FLEXIBELE VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ASSEMBLAGE DE FERMETURE SOUPLE

Publication

EP 1042153 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99945002 A

Priority

  • US 9917186 W
  • US 12455498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0034098A1] A lightweight, flexible enclosure (10), and method of installing same, to span the gap between adjacent units of an articulated railway car (12). The flexible enclosure (10) comprises three integral sections formed with a pleated configuration. An interactive, dynamic support structure (34, 37) constrains the enclosure against distortion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/00; B60D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60D 5/00 (2006.01); B61D 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60D 5/003 (2013.01); B61D 17/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0034098 A1 20000615; AU 5770899 A 20000626; CA 2246887 A1 20000128; EP 1042153 A1 20001011; EP 1042153 A4 20011017

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030903

2001-10-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE