Global Patent Index - EP 1042174 A2

EP 1042174 A2 2000-10-11 - BOX

Title (en)

BOX

Title (de)

FALTSCHACHTEL

Title (fr)

BOITE

Publication

EP 1042174 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98962623 A

Priority

  • GB 9803898 W
  • ZA 9711572 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933706A2] The invention concerns a box for-bag-in-the-box applications. The box is erected from a blank and has a rectangular bottom, four sides and a rectangular top. The top is formed by four flaps each extending foldably from an upper edge of one of the sides. These flaps overlap and interlock with one another. The flaps are additionally provided with finger-grip openings dimensioned to receive fingers of a person carrying the box. The arrangement of the openings is such that when the box is carried by fingers received in the openings provided in the opposing flaps, the interlock between the flaps prevents the flaps from parting from one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/10 (2006.01); B65D 5/468 (2006.01); B65D 75/56 (2006.01); B65D 77/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/566 (2013.01); B65D 5/103 (2013.01); B65D 5/4608 (2013.01); B65D 77/065 (2013.01); B65D 2301/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933706A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933706 A2 19990708; WO 9933706 A3 19990902; AP 1152 A 20030320; AP 200001851 D0 20000630; AU 1774999 A 19990719; AU 749574 B2 20020627; EP 1042174 A2 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEURFONTEIN MOUNTAIN ESTATES (PROPRIETARY) LIMITE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/00 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/46 B

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/00 A

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/46 B

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010531

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE