Global Patent Index - EP 1042177 A1

EP 1042177 A1 2000-10-11 - CONTAINER

Title (en)

CONTAINER

Title (de)

CONTAINER

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT

Publication

EP 1042177 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943131 A

Priority

  • SE 9801550 W
  • SE 9703162 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911524A1] The present invention relates to a container (1) having walls (2-7), an upper spout (8) at the one side (5) and a hollow handle (10), which extends, with a first end, from the spout region to the other side (6) of the container with a second end, the interior of the handle communicating with the interior (29) of the container, a passage (28) being isolated within the area of the pour spout for inflow of air for replacing the liquid discharged from the container, which air flows via said spout through the hollow handle into the container, below said handle (10) being formed a lower handle wall (17), a portion (24) of which forming said first handle end being bent upwards to screen off a tray (26), the bottom of which communicates with the interior of the container through a drain passage (30). According to the invention, said drain passage (30) extends obliquely downwards along the essential length of the upper side of the container within the region of the handle to the region of said second handle end to form a discharge zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911524A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911524 A1 19990311; AU 9099198 A 19990322; DE 69806639 D1 20020822; DE 69806639 T2 20030403; DK 1042177 T3 20021104; EP 1042177 A1 20001011; EP 1042177 B1 20020717; NO 20000879 A 20000223; NO 20000879 D0 20000223; NO 323298 B1 20070305; SE 9703162 D0 19970903

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080831

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806639 20020822

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-09-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONTAINER FOR A LIQUID

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE