Global Patent Index - EP 1042206 A1

EP 1042206 A1 2000-10-11 - DEVICE FOR RECEIVING AND/OR CONVEYING FLAT PRODUCTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR RECEIVING AND/OR CONVEYING FLAT PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFNEHMEN UND/ODER ABGEBEN FLÄCHIGER ERZEUGNISSE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR RECEVOIR ET/OU DISTRIBUER DES PRODUITS PLATS

Publication

EP 1042206 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956763 A

Priority

  • CH 9800528 W
  • CH 296797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933734A1] The invention relates to a device for receiving and/or conveying flat products (14), especially printing products, by means of individual grippers (1). The invention comprises a receiving and/or conveying section (12) along which the grippers (1) can be conveyed, and the limbs (9) support opened grippers (1) against one another in the area of the grippers, said grippers being arranged in succession. The invention also comprises a gripper closing device (15) which can be actuated after inserting a product (14) into an opened gripper (1), and/or a releasing device which can be actuated when a product (14) is released from the gripper (1). The receiving and/or conveying section (12) is curved in a convex manner in order to enlarge the maximum possible opening of the gripper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/003 (2013.01); B65H 29/02 (2013.01); B65H 2405/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933734A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933734 A1 19990708; AT 217852 T 20020615; AU 1331199 A 19990719; AU 738623 B2 20010920; CA 2308510 A1 19990708; CA 2308510 C 20070206; DE 59804212 D1 20020627; DK 1042206 T3 20020708; EP 1042206 A1 20001011; EP 1042206 B1 20020522; ES 2173642 T3 20021016; JP 2001527013 A 20011225; PT 1042206 E 20020930; RU 2191736 C2 20021027; US 6394449 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131210

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-07-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081209

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20051231

2006-12-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051209

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2005-01-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-20 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20021120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173642 T3

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-07-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804212 20020627

2002-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217852 T 20020615

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010725

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE