Global Patent Index - EP 1042207 A1

EP 1042207 A1 2000-10-11 - STACKING DEVICE

Title (en)

STACKING DEVICE

Title (de)

STAPELEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'EMPILAGE

Publication

EP 1042207 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962263 A

Priority

  • DE 9803351 W
  • DE 19757421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757421A1] Disclosed is a stacking device (40), comprising a rotational stacking wheel (10) with a plurality of fingers (14). One end (13) of said fingers is fixed to the periphery of a hub surrounding the stacking wheel axis (26). One locating gap (16) for a sheet-like product (22) is formed between said fingers. The invention is characterized in that the width of the locating gap (16) can be regulated between an open position in which the sheet-like product (22) can be inserted therein and a position in which the sheet-like product (22) is retained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/38; B65H 29/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/40 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933736A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757421 A1 19990715; DE 19757421 C2 19991021; EP 1042207 A1 20001011; EP 1042207 B1 20020508; ES 2177115 T3 20021201; US 6270073 B1 20010807; WO 9933736 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161116

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161014

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091117

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091116

2010-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031213

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177115

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021117

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-13

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010724

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE