Global Patent Index - EP 1042208 A1

EP 1042208 A1 2000-10-11 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING YARN DEFECTS DURING PRODUCTION, IN PARTICULAR CHENILLE YARNS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING YARN DEFECTS DURING PRODUCTION, IN PARTICULAR CHENILLE YARNS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DETEKTIEREN VON FADENFEHLERN WÄHREND DER HERSTELLUNG, INSBESONDERE BEI CHENILLE FÄDEN

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT DE DECELER DES DEFAUTS DU FIL, NOTAMMENT SUR DES FILS CHENILLES, EN COURS DE FABRICATION, ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1042208 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98966419 A

Priority

  • EP 9808510 W
  • IT PI980001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935075A1] An apparatus for detecting defects on a yarn (2) during production comprises a detecting device (1) and, respectively upstream and downstream of it, braking deflector means (3) of the yarn (2) and cutting means (4a, 4b) of the yarn (2). The apparatus (1) comprises a drum (5), located between two shoulders (6), on which the yarn (2) passes substantially stretched and partially wound on the drum (5) so that it is pressed against its surface and the helix effect reduced. Light emitting means (7) are provided outside the drum (5), which is transparent and comprises inside an optical sensor (8). This way the light beam coming from the emitting means (7) projects the yarn (2) on the optical sensor (8), that detects continuously the amplitude of its shadow. When the optical sensor (8) detects an increase or decrease of transversal size of the yarn (2), beyond a predetermined threshold value, the yarn is stopped, is cut and then is joined again after having eliminated the defective portion. The apparatus (1) is particularly suitable for detecting defects on chenille yarns or fancy yarns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/06; B65H 63/032; G01N 33/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/032 (2006.01); B65H 63/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/0324 (2013.01); B65H 63/065 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935075A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935075 A1 19990715; AU 2276999 A 19990726; DE 69808137 D1 20021024; DE 69808137 T2 20030528; EP 1042208 A1 20001011; EP 1042208 B1 20020918; HU 0100040 A2 20010628; IT 1304528 B1 20010319; IT PI980001 A1 19990702; IT PI980001 D0 19980102; PL 188682 B1 20050331; PL 341517 A1 20010423; TR 200002006 T2 20010723

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131230

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-08-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-12-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69808137

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000801

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-09-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010725

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000801