Global Patent Index - EP 1042289 A1

EP 1042289 A1 2000-10-11 - INDOLE NAPHTHOPYRANS, PREPARATION, COMPOSITIONS AND (CO)POLYMER MATRICES CONTAINING THEM, SYNTHESIS INTERMEDIATES

Title (en)

INDOLE NAPHTHOPYRANS, PREPARATION, COMPOSITIONS AND (CO)POLYMER MATRICES CONTAINING THEM, SYNTHESIS INTERMEDIATES

Title (de)

(INDOL)NAPHTHOPYRANE, HERSTELLUNG, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND (CO)POLYMERMATRIZEN DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN UND ZWISCHENVERBINDUNGEN ZU IHRER SYNTHESE

Title (fr)

INDOLE NAPHTOPYRANS, PREPARATION, COMPOSITIONS ET MATRICES (CO)POLYMERES LES CONTENANT ET INTERMEDIAIRES DE SYNTHESE

Publication

EP 1042289 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953636 A

Priority

  • FR 9713769 A
  • US 9821930 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770524A1] The object of the present invention is novel [indole]naphthopyrans compounds as well as the compositions and (co)polymer matrices containing them. Said compounds have interesting photochromic properties. Another object of the present invention is a method of preparing said novel compounds, as well as intermediates useful in said preparation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 209/56; C08K 5/3415; G02B 5/23; G02B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 209/56 (2006.01); C07D 311/78 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/052 (2006.01); C08G 73/06 (2006.01); C08K 5/3415 (2006.01); G02B 5/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 491/04 (2013.01); C07D 311/78 (2013.01); C08G 73/0672 (2013.01); G02B 5/23 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770524 A1 19990507; FR 2770524 B1 20000317; AR 017542 A1 20010912; AU 1096399 A 19990524; AU 743353 B2 20020124; BR 9813140 A 20001031; CA 2305753 A1 19990514; CN 1278248 A 20001227; EP 1042289 A1 20001011; EP 1042289 A4 20030611; JP 2001521922 A 20011113; WO 9923071 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INDOLE NAPHTHOPYRANS, PREPARATION, COMPOSITIONS AND (CO)POLYMER MATRICES CONTAINING THEM, SYNTHESIS INTERMEDIATES

2007-06-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033576

2003-07-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-06-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 491/052 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08K 5/3417 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 5/23 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 73/06 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 491/052 J

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 311:00 J

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 209:00 J

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL