Global Patent Index - EP 1042289 A4

EP 1042289 A4 2003-06-11 - INDOLE]NAPHTHOPYRANS, PREPARATION, COMPOSITIONS AND (CO)POLYMER MATRICES CONTAINING THEM, SYNTHESIS INTERMEDIATES

Title (en)

INDOLE]NAPHTHOPYRANS, PREPARATION, COMPOSITIONS AND (CO)POLYMER MATRICES CONTAINING THEM, SYNTHESIS INTERMEDIATES

Title (de)

(INDOL)NAPHTHOPYRANE, HERSTELLUNG, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND (CO)POLYMERMATRIZEN DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN UND ZWISCHENVERBINDUNGEN ZU IHRER SYNTHESE

Title (fr)

INDOLE]NAPHTOPYRANS, PREPARATION, COMPOSITIONS ET MATRICES (CO)POLYMERES LES CONTENANT ET INTERMEDIAIRES DE SYNTHESE

Publication

EP 1042289 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98953636 A

Priority

  • FR 9713769 A
  • US 9821930 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770524A1] The object of the present invention is novel [indole]naphthopyrans compounds as well as the compositions and (co)polymer matrices containing them. Said compounds have interesting photochromic properties. Another object of the present invention is a method of preparing said novel compounds, as well as intermediates useful in said preparation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 491/052; C08G 73/06; C08K 5/3417; G02B 5/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 209/56 (2006.01); C07D 311/78 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/052 (2006.01); C08G 73/06 (2006.01); C08K 5/3415 (2006.01); G02B 5/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 491/04 (2013.01); C07D 311/78 (2013.01); C08G 73/0672 (2013.01); G02B 5/23 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770524 A1 19990507; FR 2770524 B1 20000317; AR 017542 A1 20010912; AU 1096399 A 19990524; AU 743353 B2 20020124; BR 9813140 A 20001031; CA 2305753 A1 19990514; CN 1278248 A 20001227; EP 1042289 A1 20001011; EP 1042289 A4 20030611; JP 2001521922 A 20011113; WO 9923071 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INDOLE NAPHTHOPYRANS, PREPARATION, COMPOSITIONS AND (CO)POLYMER MATRICES CONTAINING THEM, SYNTHESIS INTERMEDIATES

2007-06-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033576

2003-07-30 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 491/052 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08K 5/3417 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 5/23 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 73/06 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 491/052 J

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 311:00 J

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07D 209:00 J

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL