Global Patent Index - EP 1042299 A1

EP 1042299 A1 2000-10-11 - NITROGEN CONTAINING HETEROAROMATICS WITH ORTHO-SUBSTITUTED P1'S AS FACTOR XA INHIBITORS

Title (en)

NITROGEN CONTAINING HETEROAROMATICS WITH ORTHO-SUBSTITUTED P1'S AS FACTOR XA INHIBITORS

Title (de)

STICKSTOFFENTHALTENDE HETEROAROMATEN MIT ORTHO-SUBSTITUIERTEN P1 GRUPPEN ALS FAKTOR-XA-INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

HETEROAROMATIQUES CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE, PRESENTANT DES GROUPES P1 A SUBSTITUTION ORTHO, ET UTILISES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR XA

Publication

EP 1042299 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962082 A

Priority

  • US 9826427 W
  • US 99644797 A
  • US 10107598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932454A1] The present application describes nitrogen containing heteroaromatics with ortho-substituted P1's and derivatives thereof of Formula (I) or pharmaceutically acceptable salt or prodrug forms thereof, wherein J is N or NH and D is substituted ortho to G on E and may be CH2NH2, which are useful as inhibitors of factor Xa.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 231/14; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/445; C07D 231/22; C07D 231/24; C07D 249/04; C07D 257/04; C07D 401/12; C07D 401/14; C07D 403/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/41 (2006.01); A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/4155 (2006.01); A61K 31/4192 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); C07D 231/14 (2006.01); C07D 231/22 (2006.01); C07D 231/24 (2006.01); C07D 249/04 (2006.01); C07D 257/04 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 257/04 (2013.01); C07D 231/14 (2013.01); C07D 231/22 (2013.01); C07D 231/24 (2013.01); C07D 249/04 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932454A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932454 A1 19990701; WO 9932454 A9 20010531; AU 1724499 A 19990712; BR 9813835 A 20001010; CA 2314401 A1 19990701; EP 1042299 A1 20001011; IL 136637 D0 20010614; JP 2001526268 A 20011218

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060223

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB PHARMA COMPANY

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB PHARMA COMPANY

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000607;LV PAYMENT 20000607;RO PAYMENT 20000607;SI PAYMENT 20000607