Global Patent Index - EP 1042384 A1

EP 1042384 A1 2000-10-11 - POLYURETHANE FOAM FOR SHOE SOLES

Title (en)

POLYURETHANE FOAM FOR SHOE SOLES

Title (de)

POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFF FÜR SCHUHSOHLEN

Title (fr)

MOUSSE DE POLYURETHANE POUR SEMELLES DE CHAUSSURES

Publication

EP 1042384 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98961579 A

Priority

  • JP 9805935 W
  • JP 36121097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6329441B1] Microcellular polyurethane elastomer shoe sole components having exceptional physical properties may be prepared from isocyanate-terminated prepolymers derived from polyoxypropylene diols having a molecular weight of from about 2000 Da to 8000 Da, an unsaturation less than about 0.02 meq/g, and a random oxyethylene content of from about 5 to about 15 weight percent. The shoe sole components exhibit high tensile strength, elongation, resilience, and in addition have excellent tear strength, particularly 90° angle tear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 18/40; C08G 18/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/08 (2006.01); C08G 18/40 (2006.01); C08G 18/48 (2006.01); C08G 18/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/4854 (2013.01); C08G 18/0857 (2013.01); C08G 18/0876 (2013.01); C08G 18/409 (2013.01); C08G 18/6674 (2013.01); C08G 2101/0008 (2013.01); C08G 2101/0066 (2013.01); C08G 2101/0083 (2013.01); C08G 2410/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933893A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6329441 B1 20011211; CN 1118501 C 20030820; CN 1283207 A 20010207; DE 69804507 D1 20020502; DE 69804507 T2 20021121; DE 69804507 T3 20060316; EP 1042384 A1 20001011; EP 1042384 B1 20020327; EP 1042384 B2 20050810; WO 9933893 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091224

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091224

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2005-08-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-06-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG

- Effective date: 20021114

2004-06-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20021203

2003-01-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BAYER AG

- Effective date: 20021114

2003-01-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20021203

2003-01-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BAYER AG

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804507

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-02

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB