Global patent index - EP 1042451 A1

EP 1042451 A1 2000-10-11 - LINOLEATE ISOMERASE

Title (en)

LINOLEATE ISOMERASE

Title (de)

LINOLEAT ISOMERASE

Title (fr)

LINOLEATE ISOMERASE

Publication

EP 1042451 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964935 A

Priority

  • US 9827612 W
  • US 6861797 P
  • US 8956098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932604A1] The present invention provides an isolated linoleate isomerase and its nucleic acid and amino acid sequence. The present invention also provides a method for producing CLA from an oil using an immobilized bacterial cell or an isolated linoleate isomerase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 1/20; C12N 9/90; C12N 11/00; C12N 13/00; C12N 15/00; C12P 1/04; C07H 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A23D 9/04 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 9/90 (2006.01); C12N 11/00 (2006.01); C12N 11/02 (2006.01); C12N 13/00 (2006.01); C12P 1/04 (2006.01); C12P 7/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 7/6427 (2013.01); C12N 9/90 (2013.01); C12N 11/00 (2013.01); C12N 11/02 (2013.01); C12P 7/6472 (2013.01); C12Y 502/01005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932604 A1 19990701; AU 2015099 A 19990712; EP 1042451 A1 20001011; EP 1042451 A4 20010704; JP 2002508929 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050729

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031022

2001-07-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12N 15/00 A, 7C 12N 1/20 B, 7C 12N 9/90 B, 7C 12N 11/00 B, 7C 12N 13/00 B, 7C 12P 1/04 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B

2000-10-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE