Global Patent Index - EP 1042478 A1

EP 1042478 A1 2000-10-11 - HERBICIDE BINDING PROTEINS AND TRANSGENIC PLANTS CONTAINING THEM

Title (en)

HERBICIDE BINDING PROTEINS AND TRANSGENIC PLANTS CONTAINING THEM

Title (de)

HERBIZID-BINDENDE PROTEINE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE TRANSGENE PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

PROTEINE CAPABLE DE LIAISON AVEC UN HERBICIDE, ET PLANTES TRANSGENIQUES CONTENANT CETTE PROTEINE

Publication

EP 1042478 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98960019 A

Priority

  • GB 9803760 W
  • GB 9726955 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932630A1] A protein which is capable of binding a herbicide, said protein comprising the sequence depicted as SEQ ID No 2 or an active part thereof or SEQ ID No 4 or an active part thereof with the proviso that the active part is not that depicted as SEQ ID Nos 35 to 38.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/13; A01H 5/00; A01N 63/02; A01N 65/00; C07K 16/44; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/13 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/8209 (2013.01); C12N 15/8258 (2013.01); C12N 15/8274 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932630A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932630 A1 19990701; AU 1570699 A 19990712; EP 1042478 A1 20001011; GB 9726955 D0 19980218

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040925

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040514

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE