Global Patent Index - EP 1042485 A2

EP 1042485 A2 2000-10-11 - DESATURASE

Title (en)

DESATURASE

Title (de)

DESATURASE

Title (fr)

DESATURASE

Publication

EP 1042485 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98962620 A

Priority

  • GB 9803895 W
  • GB 9727256 A
  • GB 9814034 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933958A2] This invention relates to cDNA sequences encoding DELTA 5-fatty acid desaturases comprising the sequences shown in SEQ.1 and SEQ.2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/53; A61K 31/20; C12N 1/19; C12N 5/10; C12N 9/02; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/81; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A23L 1/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/202 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12P 7/64 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0083 (2013.01); C12N 15/8247 (2013.01); C12P 7/6427 (2013.01); C12P 7/6472 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933958A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933958 A2 19990708; WO 9933958 A3 19990902; AU 1774899 A 19990719; BR 9814434 A 20011023; CA 2315297 A1 19990708; CN 1283230 A 20010207; EE 200000372 A 20011217; EP 1042485 A2 20001011; HU 0101153 A2 20010828; HU 0101153 A3 20060328; JP 2002508932 A 20020326; KR 20010033517 A 20010425; PL 344868 A1 20011119

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027835

2006-10-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAPIER, JOHNATHAN A.,IACR-LONG ASHTON RES.STATION

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MICHAELSON, LOUISE,BRISTOL UNIVERSITY

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STOBART, KEITH,BRISTOL UNIVERSITY

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000630;LV PAYMENT 20000630;SI PAYMENT 20000630