Global Patent Index - EP 1042498 A1

EP 1042498 A1 2000-10-11 - A METHOD OF FINDING AGONIST AND ANTAGONIST TO HUMAN 11CB SPLICE VARIANT

Title (en)

A METHOD OF FINDING AGONIST AND ANTAGONIST TO HUMAN 11CB SPLICE VARIANT

Title (de)

METHODE ZUM AUFFINDEN VON EINEM AGONISTEN UND EINEM ANTAGONISTEN DER MENSCHLICHEN 11CB SPLEISS-VARIANTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECHERCHE D'UN AGONISTE OU D'UN ANTAGONISTE DU VARIANT D'EPISSAGE DE 11 CB HUMAIN

Publication

EP 1042498 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962869 A

Priority

  • US 9825497 W
  • US 98428897 A
  • US 7374798 P
  • US 6050498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928492A1] Human 11cb splice variant polypeptides and DNA (RNA) encoding such an 11cb splice variant and a procedure for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques are disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such an 11cb splice variant for the treatment of to treat infections, such as bacterial, fungal, protozoan and viral infections, particularly infection caused by HIV-1 or HIV-2; pain; cancers; diabetes; obesity; feeding and drinking abnormalities, such as anorexia and bulimia; asthma; Parkinson's disease; both acute and congestive heart failure; hypotension; hypertension; urinary retention; osteoporosis; angina pectoris; myocardial infarction; ulcers; allergies; benign prostatic hypertrophy and psychotic and neurological disorders, including anxiety, schizophrenia, manic depression, delirium, dementia or severe mental retardation, and dyskinesias, such as Huntington's disease or Gilles de la Tourett's syndrome; among others. Antagonists against such an 11cb splice variant and their use as a therapeutic to treat infections, such as bacterial, fungal, protozoan and viral infections, particularly infection caused by HIV-1 or HIV-2; pain; cancers; diabetes; obesity; feeding and drinking abnormalities, such as anorexia and bulimia; asthma; Parkinson's disease; both acute and congestive heart failure; hypotension; hypertension; urinary retention; osteoporosis; angina pectoris; myocardial infarction; ulcers; allergies; benign prostatic hypertrophy and psychotic and neurological disorders, including anxiety, schizophrenia, manic depression, delirium, dementia or severe mental retardation, and dyskinesias, such as Huntington's disease or Gilles de la Tourett's syndrome; among others, are also disclosed. Also disclosed are diagnostic assays for detecting diseases related to mutations in the nucleic acid sequences and altered concentrations of the polypeptides. Also disclosed are diagnostic assays for detecting mutations in the polynucleotides encoding the 11cb splice variant and for detecting altered levels of the polypeptide in a host.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 21/06; C07H 21/02; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/721 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928492 A1 19990610; EP 1042498 A1 20001011; EP 1042498 A4 20030507; JP 2001525178 A 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-05-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2000-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL