Global Patent Index - EP 1042515 A1

EP 1042515 A1 2000-10-11 - CONVERTER INSTALLATION HAVING A DIVIDED SEALING RING FITTED BETWEEN THE CONVERTER AND THE FLUE GAS CHIMNEY

Title (en)

CONVERTER INSTALLATION HAVING A DIVIDED SEALING RING FITTED BETWEEN THE CONVERTER AND THE FLUE GAS CHIMNEY

Title (de)

KONVERTERANLAGE MIT GETEILTEM DICHTRING ZWISCHEN KONVERTER UND RAUCHGASKAMIN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME CONVERTISSEUR DOTE D'UN ANNEAU D'ETANCHEITE DIVISE ET PLACE ENTRE LE CONVERTISSEUR ET LA CHEMINEE DE GAZ DE COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1042515 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966525 A

Priority

  • DE 9803632 W
  • DE 19758141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19758141A1] A converter installation has a sealing ring fitted between the hood of a tilting converter and the opening of a flue gas chimney. Drives are provided for moving the sealing ring so far away from the converter hood that the converter can be tilted without problems. The sealing ring (31) is designed as a sleeve (32) which encloses the flue gas chimney from the outside. The opening of the sleeve (32) is supported on the converter hood (22), in its sealing position, and the sleeve (32) has vertical parting lines (35) which subdivide the sleeve (32) into at least two segments (33, 34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/38 (2006.01); C21C 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/38 (2013.01); C21C 5/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932669A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19758141 A1 19990701; DE 19758141 C2 19991202; AR 017863 A1 20011024; AT 214432 T 20020315; AU 2408999 A 19990712; AU 735331 B2 20010705; BR 9813754 A 20001003; CA 2315376 A1 19990701; CN 1282379 A 20010131; EP 1042515 A1 20001011; EP 1042515 B1 20020313; ES 2170548 T3 20020801; JP 2001527152 A 20011225; TW 394796 B 20000621; US 6290899 B1 20010918; WO 9932669 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051204

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2005-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2005-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2004-12-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-12-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-12-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-03 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20021203

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021202

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021119

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170548 T3

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803388 20020418

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214432 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE