Global Patent Index - EP 1042517 A1

EP 1042517 A1 2000-10-11 - LOADING DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PARTS TO BE THERMALLY TREATED IN A FURNACE

Title (en)

LOADING DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PARTS TO BE THERMALLY TREATED IN A FURNACE

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUR LADUNG VON GUTTRÄGERN FÜR THERMISCHE OFENBEHANDLUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT POUR LE SUPPORT DE PIECES A TRAITER THERMIQUEMENT DANS UN FOUR

Publication

EP 1042517 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98959989 A

Priority

  • FR 9802732 W
  • FR 9715842 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772467A1] The invention concerns a loading device, made of thermostructural composite material comprising a base plate (20), a loading shaft (30) integral with the base plate and extending over at least the whole height of the loading device, and a plurality of loading trays (40) provided with a central passage for the loading shaft to pass through. Each loading tray bears several tubular posts (50) for successively mounting the trays at predetermined intervals, with the same number of tubular posts borne by each tray aligned in such a way as to constitute, after the trays have been mounted, posts picking up load extending over the height of the loading device, and at least one of the tubular posts borne by each tray being differently arranged and/or dimensioned from the other tubular posts borne by the same tray so as to enable an indexing of the trays when they are being mounted. Each tray (40) has means (45) for positioning the parts in predetermined sites.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/32 (2006.01); C21D 9/40 (2006.01); F27D 3/12 (2006.01); F27D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 5/00 (2013.01); F27D 5/0006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931284A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772467 A1 19990618; FR 2772467 B1 20000310; AT 230804 T 20030115; CA 2315169 A1 19990624; CA 2315169 C 20080219; DE 69810662 D1 20030213; DE 69810662 T2 20031113; EP 1042517 A1 20001011; EP 1042517 B1 20030108; ES 2190124 T3 20030716; JP 2002508444 A 20020319; JP 3977595 B2 20070919; RU 2220394 C2 20031227; US 6318571 B1 20011120; WO 9931284 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131215

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131216

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131215

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131215

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69810662

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131215

2014-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 230804 T

- Effective date: 20131215

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69810662

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130104

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121205

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190124 T3

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810662 P 20030213

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230804 T 20030115

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT