Global patent index - EP 1042556 A1

EP 1042556 A1 2000-10-11 - PAPER PRODUCTS AND METHODS FOR APPLYING CHEMICAL ADDITIVES TO CELLULOSIC FIBERS

Title (en)

PAPER PRODUCTS AND METHODS FOR APPLYING CHEMICAL ADDITIVES TO CELLULOSIC FIBERS

Title (de)

PAPIERPRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON CHEMISCHEN ZUSATZSTOFFEN AUF ZELLSTOFFFASERN

Title (fr)

PRODUITS DE PAPIER ET PROCEDES POUR L'APPLICATION D'ADDITIFS CHIMIQUES SUR DES FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES

Publication

EP 1042556 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964756 A

Priority

  • US 9826834 W
  • US 7146897 P
  • US 1067598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934057A1] Chemical additives can be adsorbed on cellulosic papermaking fibers at high levels with a minimal amount of unadsorbed chemical additives present in the papermaking process water. A method includes treating a fiber slurry with an excess of the chemical additive, allowing sufficient residence time for adsorption to occur, filtering the slurry to remove unadsorbed chemical additives, and redispersing the filtered pulp with fresh water. Filtrate from the thickening process contains unadsorbed chemical additive and it is not sent forward in the process with the chemically treated fibers. The method can be employed to make improved paper products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/16 (2006.01); D21H 11/16 (2006.01); D21H 17/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/04 (2006.01); D21H 27/30 (2006.01); D21H 21/20 (2006.01); D21H 21/22 (2006.01); D21H 27/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/04 (2013.01); D21H 21/20 (2013.01); D21H 21/22 (2013.01); D21H 27/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934057A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934057 A1 19990708; AR 017855 A1 20011024; AU 2001099 A 19990719; AU 739322 B2 20011011; BR 9814354 A 20011016; BR 9814354 B1 20100601; CA 2310692 A1 19990708; CA 2310692 C 20080805; CN 1224757 C 20051026; CN 1283244 A 20010207; CO 5040185 A1 20010529; DE 69841662 D1 20100624; EP 1042556 A1 20001011; EP 1042556 B1 20100512; ID 24904 A 20000831; IL 135910 D0 20010520; JP 2002500286 A 20020108; PL 340766 A1 20010226; TR 200001834 T2 20010122; TW 440641 B 20010616

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69841662

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120701

2011-06-01 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 69841662

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110214

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20110215

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100823

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100512

2010-07-14 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2010-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69841662

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2010-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2009-11-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GOULET, MIKE, THOMAS

2009-11-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEORGER, JILL, A.

2009-11-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: POLDERMAN, DENISE, ALICE

2009-11-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WYATT, MAURICE, ALAN

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040910

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GOULET, MIKE, THOMAS

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEORGER, JILL, A.

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: POLDERMAN, DENISE, ALICE

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WYATT, MAURICE, ALAN

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GOULET, MIKE, THOMAS

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEORGER, JILL, A.

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: POLDERMAN, DENISE, ALICE

2000-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WYATT, MAURICE, ALAN

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE