Global Patent Index - EP 1042580 A1

EP 1042580 A1 2000-10-11 - DRIVE ASSEMBLY FOR A ROLLER

Title (en)

DRIVE ASSEMBLY FOR A ROLLER

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSEINHEIT FÜR EINE WICKELROLLE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR ROULEAU

Publication

EP 1042580 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964610 A

Priority

  • SE 9802336 W
  • SE 9704810 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932755A1] Drive device for a roller with a screen which can be drawn up, which drive device comprises a wheel (1) which is connected in a rotationally driving manner to said roller and which is provided around the circumference with a running channel (6) which runs between an inner (1b) and an outer (1a) side of the wheel. This running channel grips around a running line (4a, 4b). The wheel is provided in the center with an attachment device (8) for rotatable attachment to a fixed casing (2), which casing contains a receiving part (12) for the attachment device (8), and an opening (14) for an incoming end and an outgoing end of the running line. A friction block (3) is, at a point (17) at a first end, attached to a fixed member, preferably in the lower part of the casing (2), the attachment facilitating at least partial rotation around said point. The friction block is shaped at a second end (16) to lie along a sector of a circle of the wheel, in or adjacent to said running channel (6), the ends (4a, 4b) of the running line running along either longitudinal side of the friction block. In the event of the roller and with it the wheel striving to rotate without a load on one of the ends of the running line, one of said ends of the running line is taken along in the rotation of the wheel and thereby presses said second end (16) of the friction block against the wheel (1), at which rotation is checked.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/78; E06B 9/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/42 (2006.01); E06B 9/78 (2006.01); E06B 9/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/90 (2013.01); E06B 9/42 (2013.01); E06B 9/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932755A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932755 A1 19990701; AU 1990099 A 19990712; DE 69820296 D1 20040115; EP 1042580 A1 20001011; EP 1042580 B1 20031203; PL 334559 A1 20000313; SE 512152 C2 20000207; SE 9704810 D0 19971222; SE 9704810 L 19990623

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-03-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040304

2004-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820296 P 20040115

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE