Global Patent Index - EP 1042582 A1

EP 1042582 A1 2000-10-11 - WEIGHT COMPENSATION DEVICE

Title (en)

WEIGHT COMPENSATION DEVICE

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUM GEWICHTSAUSGLEICH

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE POIDS

Publication

EP 1042582 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98966927 A

Priority

  • EP 9808580 W
  • US 99815297 A
  • US 99846197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934088A1] An apparatus for facilitating the connection or disconnection of a tubular to or from a string of tubulars, which apparatus comprises a weight compensating device (12, 13, 12', 13') which can be suspended from a travelling block (TB) or a top drive (TD) or a swivel, characterised in that said apparatus further comprises a member (11) which can support a primary elevator (31) and which can, in use, be raised and lowered by said weight compensating device (12, 13, 12', 13') to enable a tubular (JC) to be raised and lowered with respect to a string of tubulars (ST) and which can move to a load bearing position in which it can raise and lower said string of tubulars.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 19/16; E21B 19/06; E21B 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/06 (2006.01); E21B 19/086 (2006.01); E21B 19/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/16 (2013.01); E21B 19/06 (2013.01); E21B 19/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934088A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934088 A1 19990708; AU 2615299 A 19990719; AU 741280 B2 20011129; CA 2316307 A1 19990708; CA 2316307 C 20070522; DE 69809966 D1 20030116; DE 69809966 T2 20030717; EP 1042582 A1 20001011; EP 1042582 B1 20021204; NO 20002455 A 20000809; NO 20002455 D0 20000511; NO 321865 B1 20060717

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20151029 AND 20151104

2015-03-25 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150318

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809966 20030116

2003-01-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030109

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010820

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL