Global Patent Index - EP 1042601 A1

EP 1042601 A1 2000-10-11 - CARBON PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

CARBON PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

KOHLENSTOFFKOLBEN FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PISTON EN CARBONE POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1042601 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99960799 A

Priority

  • DE 9903379 W
  • DE 19848649 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19848649A1] A carbon piston engine having a lower side (112) that forms a domed surface, preferably an ellipsoid surface, in the area between the enlargements of the hub (151) irrespective of the design of the lower side of the piston head, whereby said domed surface is adjacent to the enlargements of the hub. The skirt (104) of the piston has an axial profile in the form of a conical surface with straight-line generatrixes, tapering upwards as it comes into contact with the ring section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/00; F02F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/00 (2006.01); F02F 3/00 (2006.01); F02F 3/02 (2006.01); F02F 3/28 (2006.01); F16J 1/00 (2006.01); F16J 1/01 (2006.01); F16J 1/04 (2006.01); F16J 1/08 (2006.01); F16J 1/16 (2006.01); F16J 10/00 (2006.01); F16J 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/022 (2013.01); F02F 3/0084 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0448 (2013.01); F05C 2251/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0025012A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848649 A1 20000504; DE 19848649 C2 20000907; DE 19848649 C5 20081127; EP 1042601 A1 20001011; EP 1042601 B1 20040714; ES 2222045 T3 20050116; JP 2002528669 A 20020903; US 6883418 B1 20050426; WO 0025012 A1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101022

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101021

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-10-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909956

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101021

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101021

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-01-31 [29U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20061204

2007-01-31 [29W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20070502

2005-06-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAHLE INTERNATIONAL GMBH ROTERMUND + PFUSCH + BERN

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222045 T3

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909956 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE