Global Patent Index - EP 1042607 A1

EP 1042607 A1 2000-10-11 - FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFVERSORGUNGSANLAGE EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1042607 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931007 A

Priority

  • DE 9901328 W
  • DE 19834120 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19834120A1] In preart fuel supply systems comprising two series-connected fuel pumps, it was not satisfactorily possible, despite great efforts, to obtain a sufficiently precise control of the fuel quantity delivered by the second fuel pump. In particular, the change-over time of a control valve which controls the fuel quantity was quite long up to now. To solve this problem, the invention provides a control valve (30') in which the electromagnet (62) for holding the valve element (66) in the depicted initial position is flown through with just enough electricity so that the valve element (66) remains in this position. A slight change in the flow-through of the electromagnet (62) permits the control valve (30') to then change over into the final position within an extremely short time. The fuel supply system is provided for an internal combustion engine of a vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/36; F02M 59/34; F02M 59/46; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02M 59/34 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3845 (2013.01); F02M 59/34 (2013.01); F02M 59/367 (2013.01); F02M 63/0017 (2013.01); F02M 63/0033 (2013.01); F02M 63/0035 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006894A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834120 A1 20000203; EP 1042607 A1 20001011; EP 1042607 B1 20041110; JP 2002521615 A 20020716; JP 4217382 B2 20090128; US 6253734 B1 20010703; WO 0006894 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59911043

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20041110

2005-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050221

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911043

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030513

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT