Global Patent Index - EP 1042609 A1

EP 1042609 A1 2000-10-11 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1042609 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936317 A

Priority

  • DE 9901543 W
  • DE 19834475 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19834475A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines, comprising a cylindrical valve body having an outer diameter which decreases to form an annular shoulder (5) in the direction of the injection opening (12) and which is axially tensed against a retaining body by means of a tensioning nut (20) acting upon said annular shoulder (5). Said fuel injection valve is introduced into a step receiving bore (30) in the housing (32) of the internal combustion engine, said bore being sealed by means of a sealing ring (40) mounted between an annular face (22) of the retaining nut (20) and a housing step (34) of the receiving bore. Said sealing ring (40) is placed on the shaft section (10) of the valve housing with a reduced diameter, and it is axially blocked. The inventive fuel injection valve is characterised in that said sealing ring (40) has a central circular opening (42) which is deformed in a defined manner after sliding onto the shaft section (10) of the valve body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2013.01); F02M 2200/858 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008332A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834475 A1 20000203; EP 1042609 A1 20001011; EP 1042609 B1 20040804; JP 2002522694 A 20020723; US 6230686 B1 20010515; WO 0008332 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140526

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-03-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910133

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910133

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130604

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-06-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910133 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB