Global patent index - EP 1042610 A1

EP 1042610 A1 2000-10-11 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1042610 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924732 A

Priority

  • DE 9900970 W
  • DE 19835693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19835693A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve which characterises in that it comprises, for opening and closing purposes, a valve closing body (7) which can move axially along a valve longitudinal axis (2) and a valve seat body (16). A valve seat surface (29) is associated to the valve seat body (16) and said valve closing body (7) co-operates with said valve seat surface (29). The valve closing body (7) is connected to the valve seat body (16) through an elastic member (9) in the form of a diaphragm-spring. Said elastic member (9) is placed in such a way that when the valve closes it acts as a return spring for retracting the valve closing body (7) against the valve seat surface (29). The inventive fuel injection valve is particularly adapted to be used in injection arrangements of internal combustion engines with mixture compression and applied ignition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/20; F02M 51/06; F02M 61/16; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/20 (2013.01); F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 2200/50 (2013.01); Y10S 239/90 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86622 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008333A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835693 A1 20000210; EP 1042610 A1 20001011; EP 1042610 B1 20040811; ES 2226389 T3 20050316; JP 2002522695 A 20020723; US 6279841 B1 20010828; WO 0008333 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050401

2006-05-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2226389

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910198

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030508

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT