Global patent index - EP 1042615 A1

EP 1042615 A1 2000-10-11 - FLUID-ACTUATED WORKING DEVICE

Title (en)

FLUID-ACTUATED WORKING DEVICE

Title (de)

FLUIDBETÄTIGTE ARBEITSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRAVAIL ACTIONNE PAR UN FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1042615 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99953807 A

Priority

  • DE 29818762 U
  • EP 9907694 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0023716A1] The invention relates to a fluid-actuated working device comprising a housing (2) and a piston rod (6) which can be displaced with regard to the housing (2) by fluid force. At least one control valve (38, 38') which can be actuated according to the position of the piston rod (6) contains a control element. Said control element controls the fluid connection between two fluid chambers (46, 47) by interacting with a sealing area (43, 43') fixed to the housing. The control element is directly formed by the piston rod (6) which is correspondingly contoured on the outer periphery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 13/12 (2006.01); F04B 9/135 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/135 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0023716A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818762 U1 19981224; EP 1042615 A1 20001011; EP 1042615 B1 20040804; JP 2002527296 A 20020827; WO 0023716 A1 20000427

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151013

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151013

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910134

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030310

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB