Global Patent Index - EP 1042616 A1

EP 1042616 A1 2000-10-11 - PULSE-ACTUATED PNEUMATIC 4/2 DIRECTIONAL VALVE

Title (en)

PULSE-ACTUATED PNEUMATIC 4/2 DIRECTIONAL VALVE

Title (de)

IMPULSGESTEUERTES PNEUMATISCHES 4/2-WEGEVENTIL

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR 4/2 PNEUMATIQUE CONTROLE PAR IMPULSIONS

Publication

EP 1042616 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952432 A

Priority

  • DE 9902580 W
  • DE 19841056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19841056A1] The invention relates to a pulse-controlled, pneumatic 4/2 directional valve (10) whose valve system consists of two 3/2 shift valves (12, 13). According to the invention, the first shift valve (12) is a bistable slide valve while the second shift valve (13) is configured as a monostable flat-seat valve. Because of the low frictional forces of the second shift valve (13) especially short switching times are obtained. The two shift valves (12, 13) are positioned next to each other in a shared housing (11) which is highly compact and can be interconnected into valve blocks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/04; F15B 13/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/02 (2006.01); F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/042 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01); F16K 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0839 (2013.01); F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); F15B 13/0405 (2013.01); F15B 13/042 (2013.01); F15B 13/0821 (2013.01); F15B 13/0896 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0014414A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841056 A1 20000323; EP 1042616 A1 20001011; EP 1042616 B1 20021106; HU 0100339 A2 20010628; HU 0100339 A3 20011128; HU 224252 B1 20050728; JP 2002524697 A 20020806; WO 0014414 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050817

2004-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1042616E

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903313 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE